Williams v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Bobby James Williams
Defendant: Aiani Jackson
Case Number: 2:2016cv02567
Filed: October 26, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/1/2018 ORDERING Defendant to file and serve a stipulation to the dismissal of this action pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) or otherwise respond to 79 Motion to Dismiss, within 7 days. (Henshaw, R)
August 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/20/2018 DENYING 53 and 74 Requests for Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/12/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Bobby James Williams K-08880, to testify in USDC at 9:30 a.m. on 8/20/2018 in courtroom 24, before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: CKD, OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/16/2018 and stipulated between the parties to REFER this matter to mediation and STAY the proceedings until further order of the court. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on the court's ADR Division. CASE STAYED. (cc: ADR)(Yin, K)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/21/2018 DIRECTING Defendant to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to 55 and 56 Motions for Preliminary Injunctions within 21 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/6/2017 ADOPTING 41 findings and recommendations in full. Defendant's 29 motion to dismiss is DENIED. (Zignago, K.)
October 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/12/2017 GRANTING 44 Request to the extent that plaintiff shall have another thirty days within which to file objections 40 and 41 Findings and Recommendations. (Hunt, G)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/12/2017 DENYING 42 Request for Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/5/2017 DENYING 32 Motion to Compel; DENYING 33 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and RECOMMENDING that 29 Motion to Dismiss be denied. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 9/1/2017 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's 18 motion for preliminary injunction be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 6/1/2017 ORDERING defense counsel to inquire, within 14 days of the date of this order, into the status of Plaintiff's law library access and, within 21 days of the date of this order, Defendant to file a response to 18 Plaintiff's 3/2/2017 Motion; DENYING without prejudice 22 Motion for Appointment of Counsel; and DENYING without prejudice as premature 27 Plaintiff's 4/4/2017 Motion. (Henshaw, R)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/7/17 DENYING 16 Motion to Appoint Counsel.(Dillon, M)
January 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/23/17 DENYING 13 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Dillon, M)
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 12/8/16 ORDERING the Director of the CDC to collect and forward payment from the trust account of Bobby James Williams and forward payment to the court until the balan ce is paid in full. Clerk of the Court is directed to serve a copy of this order and a copy of plaintiff's signed in forma pauperis affidavit to the Director of the CDC; and the Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the Financial Department of the court. (cc CDC, Financial)(Dillon, M)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 10/27/2016 transferring case to Sacramento Division of the Eastern District of California.(Lundstrom, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby James Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aiani Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?