Goold v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Kirt Allen Goold
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02582
Filed: October 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Shasta
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/10/18 GRANTING 25 Motion for Attorney Fees. Plaintiff is AWARDED attorneys' fees in the reduced amount of $9,725.02 pursuant to the EAJA. If the government determines that plaintiff does not owe a federal debt that qualifies for offset, payment may be made in the name of plaintiff's attorney. (Coll, A)
July 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/2/2018 ORDERING 25 If the Commissioner wishes to oppose the motion for attorneys' fees, she must do so within 30 days of the date of this order. If the Commissioner submits an opposition, plaintiff shall have 14 days from the date the opposition is filed to file a reply if she wishes to do so. (Reader, L)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/30/18 GRANTING plaintiff's 15 Motion for Summary Judgment; DENYING Commissioner's 18 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment; this matter is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for an immediate award of benefits. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/25/17 ORDERING that the 14 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED in its entirety; defendant's opposition to plaintiffs motion for summary judgment, if any, shall be filed within 30 days of service of plaintiff's motion. (Benson, A)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 07/10/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall SHOW CAUSE, within 14 days, why his failure to file a motion for summary judgment, or in the alternative a request for voluntary remand, should not be deemed a waiver of the right to file such a motion at any time, and why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. (Benson, A)
December 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/14/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 5 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the United States Marshal, within fourteen days, a completed 4 Summons and copies of the 1 Complaint and to file a statement with the court attesting to such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goold v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirt Allen Goold
Represented By: Robert Weems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?