Lucien v. Macomber et al.
Plaintiff: Jaron Lucien
Defendant: Jeff Macomber, G. Turner and David Baughman
Case Number: 2:2016cv02595
Filed: October 31, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/9/2019 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/2/2019 VACATING 48 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 49 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to file opposition to 39 Motion for Summary Judgment within 30 days from the filed date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/10/19 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed for plaintiff's failure to prosecute and failure to comply with court orders. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/15/19 ORDERING that within 20 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file his opposition to defendant's summary judgment motion. (Plummer, M)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/9/18 GRANTING 32 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to submit responses to defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents within 20 days of the filed date of this order. (Coll, A)
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/6/2018 GRANTING 35 Request for a Modification to the Discovery and Scheduling Order. Defendant shall have until 12/4/2018, to take plaintiffs deposition. (Huang, H)
October 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/18/18 GRANTING plaintiff 10 days after being served with this order to file an opposition re 32 Motion to Compel. (Coll, A)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/12/2018 ADOPTING 20 Findings and Recommendations in full and DISMISSING with prejudice Plaintiff's claims against defendants Macomber, Baughman, Turner, and Boe. (York, M)
December 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/27/2017 GRANTING 21 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff to file amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/29/2017 ORDERING plaintiff has stated a cognizable claim regarding conditions of confinement against defendant Wooden and DISMISSING plaintiff's remaining clai ms against defendant Wooden with leave to file a second amended complaint within 30 days, as set forth in this order; plaintiff is not obligated to amend his complaint; and DENYING plaintiff's 17 motion for appointment of counsel. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims against defendants Macomber, Baughman, Turner, and Boe be dismissed from this action with prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/25/17 dismissing 13 Motion for a court order. Within 30 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a first amended complaint as described in the cout's order filed 04/03/17. (Plummer, M)
July 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/5/2017 ORDERING the Office of the Attorney General is instructed to contact the CSP-SAC Litigation Coordinator in accordance with this order and within 21 days, file and serve a statement reflecting the findings of such inquiry, including all appropriate declarations. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order on Monica Anderson, Supervising Deputy Attorney General. (cc: Monica Anderson)(Yin, K)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jaron Lucien signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/31/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lucien v. Macomber et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaron Lucien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Baughman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?