The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. Lexington Insurance Company
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2016cv02620
Filed: November 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Yolo
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 STIPULATION and ORDER OF DISMISSAL signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/27/2018 ORDERING the entire action is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
July 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/25/18, ORDERING that the deadline to file settlement/dismissal documents is CONTINUED to 8/27/18. (Kastilahn, A)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/06/17 ORDERING that Expert Disclosure deadline: 03/09/18 with rebuttal expert disclosure: 03/16/18; Discovery completion: 04/13/18; last day to file dispositive motions: 05/29/18; last day to hear dispositive motions: 06/26/18; joint pretrial statement due: 07/27/18; Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/3/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez and Jury Trial set for 9/10/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Benson, A.)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 1/17/2017 ORDERING that the deadline to file a Joint Status Report is EXTENDED to 2/1/2017. (Jackson, T)
December 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/22/2016 ORDERING the defendant to respond to the 1 Complaint by 1/10/2017. (Michel, G.)
December 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/14/2016 ORDERING the defendant to file a responsive pleading to the 1 Complaint by 12/22/2016. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut v. Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lexington Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Travelers Indemnity Company of Connecticut
Represented By: Kari Marie Myron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?