Hall v. Fox
Petitioner: James Earl Hall
Respondent: Robert Fox
Case Number: 2:2016cv02628
Filed: November 3, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/20/19 ORDERING the Clerk of Court shall send petitioner copies of the following: Petitioner's petition for writ of habeas corpus 1 , The court's screening order 10 , The court's findings and recommendations 11 ; and the court's final order and judgment in this action 12 , 13 . (Plummer, M)
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/26/2017 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/22/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; DENYING 6 Motion to Appoint Counsel; and DISMISSING with leave to amend 1 Petition. Petitioner to file amended petition within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hall v. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: James Earl Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Robert Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?