Moore v. Fox et al
Plaintiff: Duane Reed Moore, Sr.
Defendant: Robert W Fox, G. Thumser, Nathaniel K. Elam, J. Bick, Edmund Carolan, Darla Horgan, L.D. Zamora, Evelyn MA Teucci and Diane Toche
Case Number: 2:2016cv02641
Filed: November 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/10/23 GRANTING 63 Defendants' motion for an order staying discovery pending resolution of Defendants' motion to dismiss. Discovery in this matter is STAYED. (Kastilahn, A)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/17/23 GRANTING 60 defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Defendants' responsive pleading is due by 2/15/23. (Kastilahn, A)
December 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/02/2022 GRANTING the 58 Motion for Extension of Time. Response to Complaint due by 01/17/2023. (Spichka, K.)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/18/2022 GRANTING in PART 54 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall file a response to Plaintiff's complaint within 60 days of the date of this order. (Reader, L)
June 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 6/9/2022 DENYING 41 and 43 Motions to Appoint Counsel. (Huang, H)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/11/2022 RELIEVING Attorney Paul Richard Martin; GRANTING 27 Plaintiff's Request to Proceed Pro Se; ORDERING Clerk to redesignate this action as a pro se prisoner civil rights action; STAYING this matter for 60 days to allow Plaintiff to retain replacement counsel; and ORDERING Plaintiff to file a status report within 60 days of the date of this order regarding replacement counsel (Henshaw, R)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/14/2020 DENYING 20 Motion to remove counsel; DENYING 21 Motion to Continue all proceedings; DENYING 22 , 30 Motions for Relief from Judgment. Any further findings will be summarily stricken without further notice to the parties. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 9/25/19 DENYING 16 Motion for reconsideration. (Kaminski, H)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 8/20/19 DISMISSING this case with prejudice for failure to comply with the applicable rules and orders of this Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/07/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge and to update the docket to reflect the new case number. U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. rand omly assigned to this action. The new case number is 2:16-cv-2641 MCE CMK. The clerk of the court shall re-designate this matter as a counseled civil action. The court authorizes service on the following defendants: Fox, Thumser, Elam, Bick, Carol an, Horgan, Zamora, Teucci and Toch. The clerk of the court shall issue a summons in a civil case, the assigned District Judge's new case documents, and as appropriate to the procedures of the assigned District Judge, an order setting this matter for an initial scheduling conference. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moore v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Thumser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathaniel K. Elam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Bick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Carolan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darla Horgan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.D. Zamora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn MA Teucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Toche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duane Reed Moore, Sr.
Represented By: Paul Richard Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?