Hopson v. Yang et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Defendant: Edward Yang and Pauline Yang
Case Number: 2:2016cv02654
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/18/2017 ORDERING the scheduling order is AMENDED as follows: plaintiff is allowed leave to file her Third Amended Complaint, and shall file the Third Amended Complaint within seven (7) days; and the Dispositive Motion Hearing date is CONTINUED to 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Washington, S)
September 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/11/17 ORDERING that the scheduling order be amended, and Plaintiff is allowed Leave to File her Second Amended Complaint.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/6/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 11/3/2017. Discovery due by 12/18/2017. Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 1/12/2018. Final Pretri al Conference set for 5/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Bench Trial set for 6/25/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Case Referred to VDRP. (Kaminski, H)
May 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/1/2017 ORDERING the STAY LIFTED and SETTING an Initial Scheduling Conference for 5/11/2017 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Joint Status Report due seven days prior to 5/11/2017. (Donati, J)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/12/17 ORDERING the parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, within 7 days, why they should not be sanctioned, either in the amount of $250 each for failing to comply with court's order, or with dismissal, or both. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hopson v. Yang et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Hopson
Represented By: Daniel Joseph Malakauskas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Yang
Represented By: Christopher K. Eley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pauline Yang
Represented By: Christopher K. Eley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?