Bacon v. Pape Truck Leasing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Alfred Howard Bacon
Defendant: Pape Truck Leasing, Inc. and Eltenson Logistics, LLC
Case Number: 2:2016cv02664
Filed: November 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 2/18/2020 GRANTING 33 Pape's Motion for Summary Judgment and 39 Estenson's Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Pape and Estenson and to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Zignago, K.)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 1/6/2020 DISMISSING Complaint-in-intervention as to Sussex Insurance Company. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 8/14/2018 ORDERING 18 Defendant Pape's Motion for Summary Judgment, is GRANTED; with respect to Plaintiff's claim for punitive damages, however, the Motion is GRANTED without prejudice to Plaintiff renewing a request for damages in that regard should evidence arise that supports such damages. (Reader, L)
March 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 3/17/2018 DENYING 13 Motion to Intervene as moot and GRANTING 14 Motion to Intervene for the reasons set forth in this order. (Fabillaran, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bacon v. Pape Truck Leasing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pape Truck Leasing, Inc.
Represented By: Richard L. Alley
Represented By: Graham Matthew Cridland
Represented By: Charles Stephen Painter
Represented By: Stephen W. Robertson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eltenson Logistics, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alfred Howard Bacon
Represented By: James Martinez, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?