Maglaya v. People of the State of California
Petitioner: Jayson Maglaya
Respondent: People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2016cv02694
Filed: November 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Amador
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/26/2019 RECOMMENDING petitioner's application for a writ of habeas corpus be denied. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/29/17 DENYING 30 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
September 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/25/2017 GRANTING 23 Motion for Extension of Time. Petitioner is granted up to and including 10/12/2017 in which to file a traverse. (Henshaw, R)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/9/2017 GRANTING 14 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent to have additional 30 days, to and including 7/10/2017, to file responsive pleading. (Henshaw, R)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/26/17 granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The petition is dismissed without prejudice. Petitioner is granted thirty days from the date of this order to file an amended petition as described above. (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maglaya v. People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jayson Maglaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?