Ruffino v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Gianfranco Ruffino
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2016cv02719
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Injury
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/24/2020 ORDERING Discovery due by 9/18/2020, and Dispositive Motions filed by 12/11/2020. (Reader, L)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/2/20 SETTING following deadlines: Deadline to disclose experts on issues which a party does not bear the burden of proof: April 27, 2020. Expert rebuttal reports: June 12, 2020. Expert discovery cutoff: July 10, 2020. Deadline for hearing on dispositive motions: September 4, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/9/2019 ORDERING Fact discovery cutoff due by 1/31/2020, Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 2/28/2020, Deadline to disclose expert reports on issues for which a party does not bear the burden of proof by 3/27/2020, Deadline to disclose rebuttal expert reports by 4/24/2020, Expert discovery cutoff by 5/22/2020 and Dispositive Motions filed by 7/24/2020. (Reader, L)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 03/08/19 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART the 27 Motion to Dismiss as follows: the court DENIES defendant's motion to dismiss plaintiff's negligence claim insofar as that claim arises from USFS's alleged failure to ensure an appropriate burn boss supervised the Meow 175 fire. The motion is GRANTED with respect to all other grounds for plaintiff's negligence claim. (Benson, A.)
July 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/9/2018 ORDERING the stay on discovery shall continue until 14 days after the Court issues a ruling on the government's motion to dismiss for lack of subject matter jurisdict ion. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report no later than 14 days after the Court issues a ruling on the government's motion to dismiss to propose a schedule to govern the remainder of the case if necessary. All other pending deadlines are VACATED. (Washington, S)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 4/3/18 ORDERING that the Amended Scheduling Order is APPROVED. Defendant shall file its jurisdictional Motion on or before 5/18/18, and the hearing on Motion is moved from 4/20/18 to 6/15/18 at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom No. 3. Discovery is stayed as of 3/23/18. The remainder of the Court's scheduling order (ECF No. 24 remains in effect. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATION and ORDER to MODIFY the PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 1/23/2018 ORDERING: Deadline for government to file its jurisdictional motion; discovery stayed pending resolution of the motion due by 3/2 3/2018; Hearing on jurisdictional motion set to 4/20/2018; Fact discovery resumes set to 7/9/2018; Fact discovery cutoff due by 10/5/2018; Parties submit expert reports by 10/26/2018; Parties submit supplemental expert reports by 11/16/2018; Expert d iscovery cutoff due by 12/21/2018; Dispositive motions heard no later than 2/8/2019; Joint pretrial conference statement and motions in limine due by 5/10/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/31/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Trial briefs due by 6/24/2019; and Bench Trial set for 7/8/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Hunt, G)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/15/2017 GRANTING United States' 15 Request to Continue. The Hearing on the 14 Motion to Compel is CONTINUED to 11/29/2017, at 10:00 AM, in Courtroom 24 (CKD), before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. The parties' joint statement regarding discovery dispute shall be filed no later than 11/22/2017. (York, M)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/20/2017 ORDERING the Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF 11 ) is Amended to combine Phase One and Phase Two Discovery, with a cutoff date of 3/30/2018. All other dates established in the Amended Pretrial Scheduling Order (ECF 11 ) remain in effect. (Becknal, R)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 AMENDED STATUS (PRETRIAL SCHEDULING) ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/23/17: Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 3/30/2018. Phase One discovery shall be completed by 12/31/17; Phase Two shall be completed by March 3/30/18 . Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 8/10/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Bench Trial set for 1/21/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruffino v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gianfranco Ruffino
Represented By: Angela Jae Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?