Dimas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mayolo Dimas
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02720
Filed: November 16, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/29/2018 DENYING 23 motion for an extension of time or, alternatively, appointment of counsel and DISMISSING Case for failure to prosecute and comply with court orders. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
February 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/1/2018 ORDERING that plaintiff's renewed request for appointment of counsel (ECF No. 20) is DENIED without prejudice. In light of plaintiff's pro se status, the court will grant plai ntiff a final extension until February 15, 2018, to file his motion for summary judgment. The court notes that plaintiff has had all documents necessary to prepare his motion for nearly a year, but has still failed to file his motion. See ECF No. 13. Accordingly, plaintiff is admonished that should he fail to file his motion for summary judgment by February 15, 2018, this action will be dismissed for failure to prosecute and/or follow court orders. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); E.D. Cal. L.R. 110.(Becknal, R)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 1/8/2018 DENYING 18 Motion to Appoint Counsel and GRANTING 18 Request for an Extension of Time. (Hunt, G)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall show cause, in writing, no later than 12/20/2017, why sanctions should not be imposed for her failure to timely file her motion for summary judgment. Plaintiff shall file her motion for summary judgment no later than 12/20/2017. (Hunt, G)
November 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/18/2016 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. The Clerk is directed to issue process. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal an original and 5 copies of the completed summons, 5 copies of the complaint, and 5 copies of the scheduling order, and shall file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. (Jackson, T)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dimas v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mayolo Dimas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Scott J. Borrowman
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?