LeBlanc v. Bunch et al
Plaintiff: Antoine LeBlanc
Defendant: Bunch, Gines and Ma
Case Number: 2:2016cv02730
Filed: November 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/20/2017 RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to pay the filing fee; REFERRING this matter to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr.; ORDERING that any objections be filed within fourteen (14) days. (Michel, G.)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 9/20/17 ORDERING that the FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS filed 7/24/17 6 are ADOPTED in full; and Plaintiff's MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order 5 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/22/2017 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERING Clerk's Office to assign a US District Judge to this case; and RECOMMENDING that 5 Motion for Temp orary Restraining Order be denied. Plaintiff to submit, within 21 days from the date of this order, the filing fee of $400. Assigned and referred to Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeBlanc v. Bunch et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antoine LeBlanc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bunch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?