Leonard v. Thompson et al
Plaintiff: Frederick E. Leonard
Defendant: M. Thompson, S. Clemente and J. Metzger
Case Number: 2:2016cv02767
Filed: November 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/4/2020 ADOPTING the findings and recommendations filed 5/4/2020, in full;DISMISSING Defendant Metzger from this action; GRANTING Defendant Clemente's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 41 ) ; GRANTING Defendant Thompson's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 42 ) and DENYING Plaintiff's cross-motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 46 ). (Becknal, R)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/02/20 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court randomly assign a District Judge to this action. Also, RECOMMENDING that defendant Metzger be dismissed from this action. Def endant Clementes motion for summary judgment 41 be granted. Defendant Thompsons motion for summary judgment 42 be granted. Plaintiffs cross-motion for summary judgment 46 be denied. Motions 41 , 42 and 46 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days. (Plummer, M)
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/11/2019 GRANTING 41 and 42 Motions for Summary Judgment and DENYING 46 Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment. (Henshaw, R)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/27/2019 ORDERING counsel for defendants shall comply with Local Rule 133(j) and submit a courtesy copy of the deposition transcript or email an electronic copy of the transcript to dborders@caed.uscourts.gov no later than 3/7/2019. (Yin, K)
March 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/08/18 DENYING 35 plaintiff's Motion to Compel and DENYING 36 Motion to Appoint Counsel. (Plummer, M)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Frederick E. Leonard signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/4/2017. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and f orward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Solano County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
December 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/29/16 ORDERING that plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding t he filing of the complaint. Plaintiffs failure to comply with this order, or pay the filing fee, may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis By a Prisoner.(Dillon, M)
December 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/5/16 ORDERING that Plaintiff shall submit, within thirty days from the date of this order, a certified copy of his prison trust account statement for the six month period immediately preceding the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed without prejudice.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leonard v. Thompson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick E. Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Clemente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?