Fleming v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: George Fleming
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2016cv02811
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 416
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 1/2/20 GRANTING 26 Motion for Attorney Fees, AWARDING plaintiff $19,788.37 in attorneys fees under § 406(b). Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED to remit to plaintiff the amount of $6,600.00 for EAJA fees previously paid to counsel by the Commissioner. (Coll, A)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT OF ATTORNEY FEES signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 8/22/18. Plaintiff shall be awarded attorney fees in the amount of SIX THOUSAND SIX HUNDRED DOLLARS AND ZERO CENTS ($6,600.00), as authorized by 28 U.S.C. § 2412(d), subject to the terms of the above-referenced Stipulation. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/21/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment 19 is GRANTED; The Commissioner's Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment 20 is DENIED. This matter is REVERSED and REMANDED to the Commissioner for an immediate award of benefits; and The Clerk of the Court shall enter judgment for the Plaintiff, and close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 12/19/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff is Ordered to Show Cause, in writing no later than January 2, 2018, why this action should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute; Plaintiff's filing of a motion for summary judgment will be deemed good cause shown; and If plaintiff fails to comply with this order, his case will be dismissed. (Becknal, R)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/16/2017 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is hereby EXTENDED to 12/8/2017. (York, M)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/03/17 ORDERING that Plaintiff's time to file her summary judgment motion is EXTENDED to 11/03/17. (Benson, A.)
November 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/28/16; GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the clerk to issue process. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal the required documents and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order.(Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fleming v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Fleming
Represented By: Bess M. Brewer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?