Bontemps v. Baker, et al.
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Bontemps
Defendant: Baker, Harding, Cross and Anderson
Case Number: 2:2016cv02814
Filed: November 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/27/18 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis 4 be denied. This action be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of the filing fees. Motion 4 referred to Judge Morrison C. England Jr. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 04/18/18 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court is directed to randomly assign a District Judge and update the docket to reflect the new case number. District Judge Morrison C. England Jr. randomly assigned to this action. The new case number is 2:16-cv-2814 MCE CMK (PC). (Plummer, M)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 07/13/17 ordering this action is dismissed without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of the filing fees. The clerk of the court is directed to close this case. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/12/2017 DENYING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff to show cause in writing, within 30 days of the date of this order, why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice to re-filing upon pre-payment of filing fees. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bontemps v. Baker, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory C. Bontemps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?