Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Case Number: 2:2016cv02820
Filed: November 29, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by Senior Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 6/21/2021 DISMISSING this action with prejudice, pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1), each party to bear their own attorneys' fees and costs. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 6/18/19 GRANTING 44 Motion to Stay. Not later than 60 days following the date this Order is electronically filed, and every 60 days thereafter until the appeals in 3:17-cv- 02454-WHA and 8:18-cv-01615-DOC-DFM have been resolved, the parties shall submit a Joint Status Report reporting the status of those appellate cases. Defendant's 42 Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED without prejudice to refiling once the stay is lifted. (Kastilahn, A)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/17/2018 DENYING 21 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Washington, S)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 10/15/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 7/5/2018 DENYING 18 Motion to Stay. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Johnson
Represented By: Phyl Grace
Represented By: Russell Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Starbucks Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?