Sykes, et al. v. Shea, et al.
Plaintiff: Tyeshina Sykes and J. S.
Defendant: Donald James Shea and Kunkel Truck Lines, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02851
Filed: December 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/18/2018 DISMISSING with Prejudice Complaint Filed by Plaintiffs and Counter-Complaint Filed by Defendants. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
May 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 05/22/18 GRANTING 61 Motion to Approve Minor's Compromise. (Benson, A.)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/14/2018 ORDERING that the deadline to submit the minor's compromise for approval by the Eastern District Court has been extended 30 days, making the new deadline, 4/16/2018. (Zignago, K.)
December 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 STIPULATION and ORDER for Modification to the 12/18/2017 Pretrial Order 47 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/27/2017. The parties shall contact Magistrate Judge Delaney's courtroom deputy clerk for an earlier Settlement Conference date. [See document for further details.] cc: USMJ Delaney. (Kirksey Smith, K)
October 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER RE: DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO AMEND, MOTION TO BIFURCATE, AND MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/31/2017: IT IS ORDERED that 22 Defendants' partial motion for summary judgment be, a nd the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff Tyeshina Sykes may not recover damages for non-economic losses to compensate for her pain, suffering, inconvenience, physical impairment, disfigurement, or other nonpecuniary damages in this action; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 21 Defendants' motion to bifurcate be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 20 Defendants' motion to amend answer be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 09/12/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to 17 Stipulation, the date to disclose experts and produce expert reports is CONTINUED to 09/15/2017. (Benson, A.)
August 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/24/2017 ORDERING all parties to disclose expert witnesses by 9/8/2017 and to disclose rebuttal experts by 9/29/2017; ORDERING that expert depositions be completed by 10/31/2017; ORDERING that expert discovery be completed by 11/14/2017; ORDERING that all other elements of the 8 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Order remain in full force and effect. (Michel, G.)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/18/17 ORDERING that the disclosure of experts shall occur no later than 8/17/17 and rebuttal reports shall be served on or before 9/15/17; The cut-off date for depositions of experts is hereby extended to 10/13/17; Expert discovery shall be completed not later than 10/31/17; All other elements of the Pretrial Scheduling Order issued by the District Court on 4/4/17, remain in full force and effect.(Becknal, R)
August 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 8/15/17: The parties' stipulation to extend cut-off dates with regard to experts will be held in abeyance unless and until the parties stipulate in conformity with the substance of this Order. (Kaminski, H)
May 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/24/17: The deadline to disclose experts and produce expert reports shall occur no later than August 17, 2017, and rebuttal reports shall be served on or before September 15, 2017. The deadline to conduct depositions of experts will be extended to October 13, 2017. Expert discovery shall be completed not later than October 31, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sykes, et al. v. Shea, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyeshina Sykes
Represented By: Lauren E.S. Horwitz
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. S.
Represented By: Lauren E.S. Horwitz
Represented By: Shawn Joseph McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald James Shea
Represented By: Leeh Ann DiBello, NCAED
Represented By: J. Stephanie Krmpotic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kunkel Truck Lines, Inc.
Represented By: Leeh Ann DiBello, NCAED
Represented By: J. Stephanie Krmpotic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?