Robben v. Calaveras County Superior Court et al
Plaintiff: Todd Robben
Defendant: Calaveras County Superior Court, Grant V. Barret, California Attorney General and Andrea R. Austin
Case Number: 2:2016cv02884
Filed: December 8, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: El Dorado
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/17/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with the court rules and orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/01/18 ORDERING plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED with leave to amend. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. Plaintiff's motion to stay 14 is DENIED. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/19/2017 DENYING 5 Request for the Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/26/17 ORDERING that the court has received the Notice of Related Cases concerning the above- captioned cases filed December 15, 2016. The court has, however, determined that it is inappropriate to relate and reassign the cases set forth above, and therefore declines to do so.(Dillon, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robben v. Calaveras County Superior Court et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Robben
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calaveras County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grant V. Barret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrea R. Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?