Glass v. US Department of Justice et al
Plaintiff: Leigh Glass
Defendant: US Department of Justice, Wendy A. Garbers and Sara Winslow
Case Number: 2:2016cv02907
Filed: December 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/2017 DENYING 4 Motion for Reconsideration. (Washington, S)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/10/2017 ORDERING 4 that no later than 3/10/2017 plaintiff shall file an amended complaint that complies with the 1/6/2017 order; Failure to timely file an amended complaint will result in a recommendation that the action be dismissed. (Reader, L)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/6/2017 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff's complaint is dismissed. Plaintiff is GRANTED thirty days from the date of service of this order to file an amended omplaint. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glass v. US Department of Justice et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leigh Glass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy A. Garbers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sara Winslow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?