Goldmas v. Van Wegen, et al.
Plaintiff: Ronnie Goldmas
Defendant: L. Van Wegen, C. Lo, L. Bacerra and M. Weaver
Case Number: 2:2016cv03009
Filed: December 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER and WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/30/18 ORDERING the Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum issued on 4/17/18 30 is VACATED. The custodian shall produce Ronnie Goldmas by video co nference on 5/08/18 at 10:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Custodian is ordered to notify the court of any changes in custody and to provide new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: I.T. Dept, Sacramento and CKD)(Plummer, M)
April 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/16/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Ronnie Goldmas F-31549, to testify in USDC at 9:30 a.m. on 5/8/2018 in courtroom 24, before Magistrate J udge Carolyn K. Delaney; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Director of Atascadero State Hospital. (cc: CKD, OTCD-SAC)(Yin, K)
March 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 AMENDED ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/21/2018 VACATING the 26 order filed 3/21/2018. This case is set for a Settlement Conference on 5/8/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney. Within ten days of this order, plaintiff shall return the attached form notifying the court whether he would like to attend the settlement conference in person or by video. Each party shall provide a confidential settlement statement to chambers, in accordance with this order, no later than 5/1/2018. (cc: CKD) (Yin, K)
March 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/20/18 ORDERING ( Settlement Conference set for 5/8/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 24 (CKD) before Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney.) Parties are directed to submit confidential settlement stateme nts no later than May 1, 2018 to ckdorders@caed.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff shall mail his confidential settlement statement Attn: Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney, USDC CAED, 501 I Street, Suite 4-200, Sacramento, California 95814 so it arrives no later than May 1, 2018. The envelope shall be marked CONFIDENTIAL SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Parties are also directed to file a Notice of Submission of Confidential Settlement Statement (See L.R. 270(d))(cc: CKD)(Plummer, M)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 9/13/2017 VACATING the 7/12/2017 12 findings and recommendations. Plaintiff shall submit a letter within 21 days clarifying whether he is willing to proceed on the complaint as screened or whether he wishes to dismiss all his claims except his Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against CO Bacerra and Sgt. Van Wegen. (Yin, K)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/26/2017 RECOMMENDING this case be stayed until plaintiff is released from the mental health clinic; plaintiff be ordered to inform the court when he is released from the clinic; and the Clerk be directed to administratively close this case. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/02/17 ordering that plaintiff show cause within 14 days from the date of this order why this action should not be dismissed for failure to comply with a court order.(Plummer, M)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronnie Goldmas signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/31/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldmas v. Van Wegen, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Goldmas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Van Wegen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Bacerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Weaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?