Canada v. Macomber et al
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Canada
Defendant: Macomber and E. Roberts
Case Number: 2:2017cv00066
Filed: January 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 06/28/17 ordering this action is dismissed without prejudice. CASE CLOSED. (Plummer, M)
May 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ronald Lee Canada signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 05/15/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
March 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/7/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 13 request to proceed IFP. Plaintiff shall submit, within 30 days, a completed ifp application. The Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 01/13/17 ORDERING that plaintiff's 1 Motion for TRO is DENIED without prejudice; plaintiff has 30 days to file a complaint that complies with the requirements of the Civil Rights Act, the FRCP, and the Local Rules; and the application to proceed in forma pauperis or the $400 filing fee. Clerk shall send plaintiff the court's form for filing a civil rights action and the IFP application. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Canada v. Macomber et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Canada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Macomber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?