Shephard Mechanical Contractors, Inc. v. K.O.O. Construction, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Shephard Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Defendant: K.O.O. Construction, Inc. and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2017cv00094
Filed: January 17, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2018 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/06/18 DISMISSING this action WITH PREJUDICE in its entirety and each party shall bear its own costs and fees. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
February 26, 2018 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/26/18 DENYING as moot 22 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Within twenty-one (21) days of this order, the parties shall provide this court with dispositional documents, or request an extension of time based upon good cause. (Kaminski, H)
December 18, 2017 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/18/17: Parties in Sheppard Mechanical Contractors, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, et al., 2:17-cv-00094-KJN, shall file dispositional documents by February 14, 2018. Within fourteen (14) days of this order, parties shall show cause as to why the hearing set for January 25, 2018 should not be vacated, and why the motions to consolidate (DKB, Inc., 2:17-cv-01425-KJN, ECF No. 19; Sheppard Mechanical, 2:17-cv-00094-KJN, ECF No. 22) should not be denied as moot. (Kaminski, H)
December 6, 2017 24 Opinion or Order of the Court RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2017. (York, M)
September 5, 2017 21 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/1/2017 ORDERING that mediation be completed by 1/9/2018. (cc: VDRP) (Michel, G.)
June 16, 2017 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/16/2017 STAYING this action and REFERRING this matter to the court's Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program; ORDERING the parties to contact the court's VDRP Administrator within fourtee n (14) days; DIRECTING the parties to carefully review and comply with Local Rule 271 regarding specifications and requirements of the VDRP; ORDERING the parties to jointly file a VDRP Completion Report within fourteen (14) days after completion of the VDRP session; ORDERING that any objections be filed within seven (7) days. (cc: VDRP)(Michel, G.)
June 12, 2017 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/9/2017 ORDERING this case is REFERRED to the Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings and entry of final judgment. Any hearing dates currently set before the Hon. John A. Mendez are VACATED. Th e Clerk of the Court to REASSIGN this case to the Honorable, Kendall J. Newman, U. S. Magistrate Judge. The parties shall please take note that all documents hereafter filed with the Clerk of the Court shall bear case number 2:17-cv-00094 KJN. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shephard Mechanical Contractors, Inc. v. K.O.O. Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shephard Mechanical Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Russell McCutcheon, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.O.O. Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?