Mills v. Fox et al

Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Mills
Defendant: Robert W. Fox and A. Goodson
Case Number: 2:2017cv00152
Filed: January 24, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/27/2019 ADOPTED in FULL 14 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Fox are DISMISSED without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim; Plaintiff's c laims related to the conditions of his confinement be dismissed without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim, and this action proceeds on the original complaint on plaintiff's access to the courts claim against defendant Goodson only. (Reader, L)
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 2/4/2019 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 12/06/18 RECOMMENDING that plaintiffs claims against defendant Fox be dismissed without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim. Plaintiffs claims related to the c onditions of his confinement be dismissed without further leave to amend for failure to state a claim; and this action proceed on the original complaint on plaintiffs access to the courts claim against defendant Goodson only. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/24/2018 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Huang, H)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/06/18 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kenneth Wayne Mills. CDC shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial). (Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mills v. Fox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W. Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Goodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Mills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?