Bess v. Adams & Associates, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kevin Bess
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00173
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2003
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/24/2020 EXTENDING the cutoff deadlines as follows: The cutoff for non-expert discovery is EXTENDED to 10/26/2020. The expert witness disclosure deadline is EXTENDED to 11/6/2020; and the last day to hear dispositive Motions is CONTINUED to 4/15/2021. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/24/2020 CONTINUING cutoff for non-expert discovery to 7/27/2020, expert witness disclosure to 8/7/2020, and the last day to hear dispositive motions to 1/7/2021. (Zignago, K.)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/6/20 ORDERING that the cutoff for non-expert discovery is extended to April 6, 2020; the expert witness disclosure deadline is extended to April 16, 2020; and the last day to hear dispositive motions is continued to August 20, 2020. (Kaminski, H)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/15/2019 EXTENDING the Non-Expert Discovery Cutoff by 60 days, until 1/7/2020. (Huang, H)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2018 GRANTING 15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The Court GRANTS, without leave to amend, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims for retaliation and intent ional infliction of emotional distress and GRANTS, with leave to amend, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's claims for discrimination based on race and age, wrongful termination, and failure to prevent discrimination. (York, M)
December 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/4/17 ORDERING the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 4 ) is hereby GRANTED as to all claims with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of this Order. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bess v. Adams & Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: John H. Adams, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Gayland Pedhirney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bess
Represented By: William Lawrence Bowen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?