Brown v. Cisneros
Plaintiff: Bobby Brown
Defendant: I. Cisneros
Case Number: 2:2017cv00177
Filed: January 26, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 02/05/19 ORDERING that within 21 days from the date of this order, counsel for defendants shall file a status report as to the payment of settlement proceeds in this action. (Plummer, M)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 08/08/18 DISMISSING case with prejudice pursuant to 48 Stipulation; each side to bear its own litigation costs and attorney's fees. CASE CLOSED (Benson, A.)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/26/2018 ORDERING the custodian to produce Bobby Brown V-58117, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 8/7/2018 in courtroom #25, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Warden. (cc: KJN, OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
April 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 04/03/18 DENYING 33 Motion to compel. (Plummer, M)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/30/2018 ORDERING case set for Settlement Conference on 8/7/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Within 10 days after the filing date of this order, pla intiff to return the attached form notifying the court whether he would like to attend the settlement conference in person or by video. Parties to exchange non-confidential settlement statements 7 days prior to the settlement conference. (cc: KJN) (Henshaw, R)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/19/2017 DENYING plaintiff's 26 motion for the appointment of counsel ; DENYING plaintiff's 28 motion for the appointment of an outside doctor; and DENYING plaintiff's 27 request for inspection. (Yin, K)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/29/2017 GRANTING 11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading due on or before 8/19/2017. (Henshaw, R)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Bobby Brown signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 03/31/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Cisneros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?