Hillery v. Barretto et al

Plaintiff: Booker T. Hillery
Defendant: Jennifer Barretto, V. Winthrop, A. Kaur, Diane O'Laughlin, L. Masstretti, Paik and J. Lewis
Case Number: 2:2017cv00191
Filed: January 27, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/26/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING 1 Complaint be dismissed for failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b). Assigned and referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
February 14, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/13/2018 DENYING without prejudice 19 Motion to Compel; STAYING current discovery dates in 18 Order for 30 days from the date of this order; ORDERING defense counsel to contact appropriate in dividual(s) at CHCF to determine whether Plaintiff has been hospitalized at any time between his return in 12/2017 to date and inform the court via sworn declaration of findings within 30 days of the date of this order; and ORDERING Plaintiff to show cause why he failed to reply to defendants' interrogatories and failed to reply to 18 Order within 30 days of the date of this order. At the end of the 30 day stay, either party may file a motion to amend the scheduling order in a manner consistent with the parties' pending statement to the court.. (Henshaw, R)
July 17, 2017 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/14/2017 DIRECTING Clerk to return the USM-285 forms for completion with blank summons and instructions for service and ORDERING Plaintiff to submit the completed summons and USM-285 forms within 30 days. (Henshaw, R)
June 16, 2017 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Booker T. Hillery signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/16/2017. The Director of the CDCR shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial). (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hillery v. Barretto et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Booker T. Hillery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Barretto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Winthrop
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane O'Laughlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Masstretti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?