Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Laura Lee Thompson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00216
Filed: January 31, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/9/18, ORDERING that Plaintiff is AWARDED attorney fees in the amount of $6,000.00. (Kastilahn, A)
February 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/7/2018 ORDERING that Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 22 ) is GRANTED; Defendant's cross-motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 23 ) is DENIED; the Commissioner's decision is REVERSED; this matter is REMANDED for further proceedings consistent with this order; and the Clerk shall enter judgment for plaintiff and close this case. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/11/2017 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiff to file her Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 11/6/2017. All amended deadlines will be extended accordingly. (Washington, S)
September 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/12/17, ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiff to file her Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 10/6/2017. All amended deadlines will be extended accordingly. (Kastilahn, A)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/8/2017 ORDERING the deadline for Plaintiff to file their Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 9/7/2017. All amended deadlines will be extended accordingly. (Washington, S)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/10/2017 GRANTING an extension of time and ORDERING plaintiff to file Motion for Summary Judgment by 8/7/2017. (Donati, J)
February 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/1/2017 ORDERING No later than 2/17/2017, plaintiff shall file an amended complaint alleging the county of plaintiff's residence. GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP and DIRECTING the clerk to issue process. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the United States Marshal the required documents and to file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thompson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Represented By: Richard M. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Lee Thompson
Represented By: Kenneth James Collins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?