Witkin v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Michael Aaron Witkin
Defendant: M. Lee, E. Arnold, C. Alipaz, C Alvarez and B Eidhammer
Case Number: 2:2017cv00232
Filed: February 2, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/9/2020 DENYING 56 Motion for Relief from Judgment. (Coll, A)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/29/2020 ADOPTING in full 50 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 37 defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The case is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(A). CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 05/15/2020 RECOMMENDING the 37 Motion to Dismiss be granted and that the case be dismissed with prejudice. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due 14 days after being served with these Findings and Recommendations. (Tupolo, A)
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/3/2019 REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigne d DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Henshaw, R)
November 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/30/18 GRANTING 26 Motion for Extension. Defendants Lee, Alvarez, Dinh, Matteson, Neuschmid, and Arnold are GRANTED 21 days from the date of this order to execute waivers of service. (Coll, A)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/16/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's 17 motion for reconsideration; plaintiff will be permitted to proceed on his claim arising under California law; and in a separate order, the court will order that defendants Alvarez, Dinh, Lee, Matteson, Maurino, Arnold and Neuschmid be served with process. (Yin, K)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/18/2018 ORDERING, within 21 days, plaintiff shall complete and return the attached form notifying the court whether he wants to proceed on his Eighth Amendment claims against defendants Alvarez, Dinh, Lee, Matteson, Maurino, Arnold and Neuschmid, or whether he wishes to file a third amended complaint in an attempt to cure the deficiencies with respect to his claims arising under California law. (Yin, K)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/20/17 DISMISSING 9 plaintiff's amended complaint. Plaintiff is granted 30 days from the date of service of this order to file a second amended complaint. (Plummer, M)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Michael Aaron Witkin signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/24/2017. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forw ard to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial)(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Witkin v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Aaron Witkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Alipaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C Alvarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Eidhammer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?