United States of America v. Lavin
Petitioner: United States of America
Respondent: Peter Lavin
Case Number: 2:2017cv00298
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/27/18 ADOPTING the 8/8/17 Order (ECF No. 7) as the final order of the court and Judgment is entered granting Petitioner's petition. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER APPROVING LEVY UPON PRINCIPAL RESIDENCE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/8/17 ORDERING that pursuant to Internal Revenue Code section 6334, the Court GRANTS the Petition for Judicial Approval of Levy upon a Principal Residence. The Internal Revenue Service may levy upon Peter Lavin's interest in the property located at 4968 Summer Place Road, Forest Ranch, CA 95942. (Becknal, R)
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 3/27/2017 ORDERING that Respondent have twenty-five (25) days from the date of this Order to file with the Clerk of Court a written OBJECTION TO PETITION. It is further ORDERED that if you file a written OBJECTION TO PETITION with the Clerk of Court, then the Court will hold a hearing, at which you must appear, on 5/17/2017 at 10:30 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. It is FURTHER ORDERED that, in add ition to filing your OBJECTION TO PETITION with the Clerk of Court, you must also mail a copy of your OBJECTION TO PETITION to the attorney for the United States, Rika Valdman, U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division, Western Region, P.O. Box 683, W ashington, D.C. 20044, on or before the filing date. It is FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this NOTICE AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, together with the Petition and Declaration, shall be served upon PETER LAVIN within five (5) days of the date of this Order, by the United States Marshal or any deputy U.S. Marshal, or any Revenue Officer of the Internal Revenue Service.(Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Lavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: United States of America
Represented By: Rika Valdman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Peter Lavin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?