Purdy v. Attorney General of the State of California
Petitioner: Helen Sophia Purdy
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2017cv00307
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Gregory G. Hollows
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/27/18 ADOPTING 21 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Petitioner's Response, ECF No. 15, liberally construed as a Rule 4(a)(4) motion is DENIED. This order addresses ECF No. 20 and resolves ECF No. 21. (Kaminski, H)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 03/01/18 STRIKING 25 Motion to Amend. Any additional filings by petitioner should be directed to the Ninth Circuit Court ofAppeals for consideration within the context of her pending appeal. Petitioner shall file no further pleadings in this court until the appeal is resolved, andonly if it is sent back for further adjudication in this court. (Plummer, M)
December 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/13/2017 GRANTING 22 Request. Petitioner's objections to 21 Findings and Recommendations shall be due on or before 12/26/2017. (York, M)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/22/2017 RECOMMENDING 15 Rule 52(b) "Response" should be denied and, to extent that the most recent case is intended to be brought in habeas corpus, no Certificate of Appealability should issue. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/8/2017 DENYING 12 Motion for Extension; Petitioner's writ is DISMISSED without prejudice; No certificate of appealability will issue; and The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. CASE CLOSED(Washington, S)
May 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 5/14/2017 RECOMMENDING the petition be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 3/10/2017 GRANTING petitioner's 2 motion to proceed IF; petitioner's petition/complaint is DISMSISED with leave to amend; petitioner may file an amended complaint in conformity with the dictates of this order, within 30 days. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purdy v. Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Helen Sophia Purdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?