Mostajo et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Anthony Marc Mostajo and Elaine Quedens
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00350
Filed: February 16, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/21/2019 GRANTED IN PART and DENYING IN PART defendant's 49 Motion for Reconsideration and CERTIFIES its 11/14/2018 48 Order for interlocutory appeal. Plaintiffs' counsel ORDERED to pay sanctions in the amount of $400 to the Clerk of the Court within five days of the date of this Order. (Zignago, K.)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/18 GRANTING 29 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and DENYING 39 Cross-Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (Coll, A)
September 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 09/05/18 GRANTING Request to Seal. (Benson, A.)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/8/2018 GRANTING plaintiffs' request to seal. The unredacted version of the Workman Decl. and the exhibits shall be SEALED until further order of this Court. (Zignago, K.)
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/23/2018 ORDERING that the deadline to file the Third Updated Joint Status Report shall be EXTENDED to 4/6/2018. (Reader, L)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/13/2018 GRANTING leave to file Second Amended Complaint. (Zignago, K.)
June 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/21/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 04/17/17 ORDERING that the deadline to file the Joint Status Report is EXTENDED to 04/21/17. (Benson, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mostajo et al v. Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Marc Mostajo
Represented By: Robin G. Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Quedens
Represented By: Robin G. Workman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Barbara Allyn Blackburn
Represented By: Britney Noelle Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?