Hartley et al v. On My Own, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Amber Hartley and Janice Taylor
Defendant: On My Own, Inc., On My Own Community Services and On My Own Independent Living Services
Case Number: 2:2017cv00353
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/25/2020 GRANTING 48 plaintiff's Motion to Approve PAGA Settlement. A Status Conference on implementation of the settlement is set for 2/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The action is DISMISSED with prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/18/2019 MODIFYING scheduling order as follows: Discovery deadline 5/19/2020; Expert Disclosure deadline 6/23/2020; Rebuttal Expert Disclosure deadline 7/13/2020; Expert Discovery Completion deadline 8/17/2020; Last day to hear Dispositive Motions 10/16/2020. (Zignago, K.)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/20/19 ORDERING that plaintiff Janice Taylor DISMISSED from this matter with prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/4/19 ORDERING all discovery shall be completed by 12/19/2019. Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 1/23/2020. Dispositive Motions shall be heard no later than 5/15/2020. (Kaminski, H)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/24/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/10/2018 ORDERING that Ms. Taylor show cause within fourteen (14) days of the date of this order why her case should not be dismissed for her failure to prosecute. (Zignago, K.)
August 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/1/2018 GRANTING 20 Motion to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. With the exception of plaintiffs' PAGA claims, this action is STAYED pending completion of arbitration; The part ies shall file a joint status report within 14 days with the contents as prescribed by the court's initial scheduling order, proposing dates for litigation of the PAGA claims; and The parties shall NOTIFY the court within 14 days of the completion of the named plaintiffs' arbitration proceedings. (York, M)
November 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 11/03/17 GRANTING 24 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorneys Richard Anderson Hoyer and Ryan Lee Hicks terminated for Janice Taylor. (Benson, A.) Modified on 11/6/2017 (Benson, A.).
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 7/12/17 ORDERING that Initial disclosures shall becompleted within 14 days of the scheduling conference. Counsel shall file the motion to compel arbitration within 10 days of the scheduling conference. Hearing on defendants' motion to compel arbitration is SET for 9/22/2017 at 10:00 a.m. in courtroom 3. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartley et al v. On My Own, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amber Hartley
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Taylor
Represented By: Ryan Lee Hicks
Represented By: Richard Anderson Hoyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On My Own, Inc.
Represented By: Alden John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On My Own Community Services
Represented By: Alden John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On My Own Independent Living Services
Represented By: Alden John Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?