Galasyn et al v. Sleight et al
Plaintiff: Edward Galasyn and Marta A. Kingsbury
Defendant: Vicky Sleight, Douglas Shaw and Galasyn, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00363
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/5/2017 ORDERING defendants Douglas Shaw, Vicky Sleight and Galasyn, Inc. shall have an extension of time to 12/8/2017 to file a responsive pleading to the complaint. (Zignago, K.)
October 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/3/2017 EXTENDING time to 11/28/2017 for Defendants to file their responsive pleading to the complaint. (Donati, J)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER FORSTANDARD LITIGATION signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 8/2/17. (Kastilahn, A)
August 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/31/2017 ORDERING that the time for defendants Shaw, Sleight and Galasyn, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED to 9/29/2017. (Washington, S)
June 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/29/17 ORDERING that Defendants DOUGLAS SHAW, VICKY SLEIGHT, and GALASYN, INC. shall have an extension of time to 7/31/2017, to file a responsive pleading to the Complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 05/30/17 ORDERING that the time for defendants Shaw, Sleight and Galasyn, Inc. to respond to the Complaint is Extended to 06/29/17. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galasyn et al v. Sleight et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Galasyn
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marta A. Kingsbury
Represented By: William Wayne Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vicky Sleight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Shaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Galasyn, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?