Willis v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A Willis
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00366
Filed: February 17, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/27/2017 DENYING 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Set Aside the Judgment. (Kirksey Smith, K)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/20/2017 GRANTING 19 Request by William Idleman for JP Morgan Chase to appear telephonically at the motion hearing set for 11/27/2017 at 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call.(Kirksey Smith, K)
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/13/2017 DENYING 18 Plaintiff's counsel's request to appear by telephone at the motion hearing set for 11/27/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/5/2017 re 3 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss: IT IS ORDERED that defendant's Motion to dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a First Amended Complaint, if she can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/24/2017 GRANTING 6 defendant's counsel's request to appear telephonically at the motion hearing set for 4/3/2017 at 1:30 p.m. The courtroom deputy shall email counsel with instructions on how to participate in the telephone conference call. (Kirksey Smith, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Willis v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth A Willis
Represented By: Janice Dudensing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: William J. Idleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?