Banks v. Moule et al
Plaintiff: Damion M. Banks
Defendant: Kimberly Moule and Kris Hamilton
Case Number: 2:2017cv00381
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/22/2018 DIRECTING the Clerk to assign a U.S. District Judge to this case. Judge John A. Mendez assigned. It is hereby RECOMMENDED that this action be dismissed without prejudice for plaintiff's failure to prosecute. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Fabillaran, J)
January 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/5/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to file, within 30 days of the date of this order, an opposition to 14 Motion to Dismiss. (Henshaw, R)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/28/2017 DIRECTING plaintiff to file, within 30 days of the date of this order, any opposition to the 14 Motion to Dismiss. (York, M)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/22/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Damion M. Banks. The Director of the CDCR shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department)(Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks v. Moule et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Damion M. Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Moule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kris Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?