Takano et al v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Plaintiff: Tom Takano and Tracy McCarthy
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Case Number: 2:2017cv00385
Filed: February 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/2/19 EXTENDING the Procter & Gamble Company's time to answer the Complaint to 1/16/2019. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/2018 ORDERING that P&G's deadline to answer the Complaint shall be EXTENDED to 1/2/2019. (Washington, S)
November 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 11/6/2018 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that P & G's time to answer the Complaint shall be EXTENDED to 12/5/2018. (Reader, L)
October 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/23/2018 GRANTING in PART and DENYING in PART 6 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims based on Defendant's website is GRANTED with leave to amend. Defen dant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims to Products they have not purchased is DENIED. Defendants Motion to Dismiss Counts I, II, III, IV, V, VI, VII, IX, and X is DENIED. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Count VIII is GRANTED with pr ejudice as to Plaintiffs' New York Negligent Misrepresentation Claim, but DENIED as to Plaintiffs' California Negligent Misrepresentation Claim. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' punitive damages claims is DENIED. Should Plaintiffs elect to do so, Plaintiffs are granted 30 days from the date of this Order to file a first amended complaint. Defendant is afforded 21 days from the date Plaintiffs file an amended complaint to answer the complaint. (Washington, S)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/10/17. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Takano et al v. The Procter & Gamble Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Takano
Represented By: Yeremey Olegovich Krivoshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy McCarthy
Represented By: Yeremey Olegovich Krivoshey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Procter & Gamble Company
Represented By: Thomas Arnold Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?