United States of America v. Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $4,600.00 in U.S. Currency and Approximately $3,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Claimant: Sydona Anderson Fernandez and Al Shoman
Case Number: 2:2017cv00398
Filed: February 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/23/17. The Court adopts the Stipulation for Final Judgment of Forfeiture entered into by and between the parties to this action. Judgment is hereby entered against claimant Sydona Anderson Fernandez on Behalf of Estate of Jason Derek Anderson and all other potential claimants who have not filed claims in this action. Upon entry of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture, all right, title, and interest of Sydona Anderson Fe rnandez on Behalf of Estate of Jason Derek Anderson in the Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency, Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency and $1,100.00 of the Approximately $4,600.00 in U.S. Currency, together with any inte rest that may have accrued on the total amount seized, shall be forfeited to the United States pursuant to 21 U.S.C. § 881(a)(6), to be disposed of according to law. Upon entry of a Final Judgment of Forfeiture herein, but no later than 60 day s thereafter, $3,500 of the Approximately $4,600.00 in U.S. Currency and $3,700.00 of the Approximately $3,700.00 in U.S. Currency, shall be returned to claimant Sydona Anderson Fernandez on Behalf of Estate of Jason Derek Anders on through her attorney Carolyn Hagin. All parties are to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. The U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California, Hon. William B. Shubb, District Judge, shall retain jurisdiction to enforce the terms of this Final Judgment of Forfeiture. CASE CLOSED.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/31/2017. (Washington, S)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/27/2017 DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to issue a Warrant for Arrest of Articles In Rem for the defendant currency. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $5,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $4,600.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $3,700.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Sydona Anderson Fernandez
Represented By: Carolyn Murray Hagin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Al Shoman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?