Foster v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Dimitrius Foster
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00439
Filed: February 27, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/3/19 DENYING 27 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 28 Motion for Summary Judgment; and AFFIRMING the Commissioner's final decision. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
February 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 2/13/2018 ORDERING that the Defendant shall submit a Supplemental Certified Administrative Record by 2/28/2018. To the extent, that Plaintiff believes additional briefing is required based on the supplemental CAR, pursuant to the Court's original 7 scheduling order, Plaintiff shall have 45 days to file a new Motion for Summary Judgment after service of the supplemental CAR. Following filing and service of any new Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff, Defendant shall have 30 days to respond, and Plaintiff shall have 20 days to file and serve a reply brief, if any, following service of Defendant's response and/or Cross-Motion. (Washington, S)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/24/2018 ORDERING that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment be EXTENDED to 2/28/2018. (Reader, L)
January 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 1/16/2018 ORDERING that Defendant's time to respond to Plaintiff' Motion for Summary Judgment is EXTENDED to 1/29/2018. (Reader, L)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 12/21/2017 EXTENDING time until 1/22/2018, for Defendant to file her Cross-Motion for Summary Judgment and Opposition to 13 Motion. (York, M)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 11/28/17: The time for responding to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment shall be extended to December 22, 2017.(Kaminski, H)
May 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/24/2017 GRANTING 4 Motion to Proceed IFP; DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to serve the 7 Scheduling Order in Social Security Cases; ORDERING the plaintiff to submit to the U.S. Marshal within f ifteen (15) days, a completed 6 Summons and copies of the 1 Social Security Complaint and to file a statement with the court attesting to such service; DIRECTING the U.S. Marshal to serve all process without prepayment of costs within sixty (60) days. (cc: U.S. Marshal) (Michel, G.)
April 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/12/2017 DENYING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDERING the plaintiff to pay the filing fee or submit a completed Application for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis within 15 days. (Michel, G.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foster v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dimitrius Foster
Represented By: Monica Perales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?