Barnes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Sarah M Barnes
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00458
Filed: March 1, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/7/2018 DENYING Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING Defendant's 16 Motion for Summary Judgment; AFFIRMING the Commissioner's final decision; and DIRECTING the Clerk to enter judgment and close this file. CASE CLOSED (Becknal, R)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 9/11/2017 ORDERING that the time for Defendant to file an Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment, originally due on 10/2/2017, by 45 days, through and including Thursday, 11/16/2017. (Reader, L)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting 2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 4/4/17: The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve on plaintiff scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal. (Kaminski, H)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barnes v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah M Barnes
Represented By: Young Chul Cho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Daniel Adam Lazar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?