Belyew v. Hornea et al
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Defendant: Kory L. Hornea and Gregory Jo Ahern
Case Number: 2:2017cv00508
Filed: March 9, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/14/2020 DENYING defendants' 32 motion to dismiss, without prejudice to a motion in the proper form. Within 14 days, defendants must: (1) re-file their motion to dismiss without the exhaustion argument; (2) file a motion for summary judgment on exhaustion that complies with the applicable rules and includes the notice required by Rand v. Rowland, 154 F.3d 952, 957 (9th Cir. 1998) (en banc); or (3) answer the complaint. (Yin, K)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 6/3/20 ADOPTING 26 Findings and Recommendations. Plaintiff's claims against defendant Honea are dismissed without leave to amend. This matter is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Kaminski, H)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/30/2020 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms with Notice of Submission of Documents within 30 days from the date of this order; ORDERIN G Clerk to randomly assign a U.S. District Judge to this action; and RECOMMENDING Plaintiff's claims against defendant Honea be dismissed without leave to amend. Service is appropriate for Moreland and Spencer. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Su mmons, 2 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Amended Complaint filed on 10/31/2019. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 30 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Lisa Belyew signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/16/2019. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
May 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/2/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a certified copy of her prison trust account statement. (Henshaw, R)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/4/201 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, a certified copy of her prison trust account statement. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this order will result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed.(Yin, K)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/17/2017 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp; the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application; and plaintiff's 2 motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Belyew v. Hornea et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Belyew
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kory L. Hornea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Jo Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?