Welch v. Butte County Jail et al
Plaintiff: Edward Roy Welch
Defendant: Butte County Jail, Butte County Jail Officials and B. Stratton
Case Number: 2:2017cv00517
Filed: March 8, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE and REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/28/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's 54 motion for an extension of time is DENIED; plaintiff shall serve his discovery responses on counsel f or defendant within 14 days. Plaintiff's 55 motion to compel is partially granted, as follows: (A) Plaintiff is granted leave to forthwith propound interrogatories to defendant Stratton specifically seeking the identity of those jail emplo yees identified by handwriting and handwritten initials on Bates DEF Nos. 000011, 000013, and 000016. (B) Plaintiff is granted leave to forthwith propound interrogatories or a request for production of documents to determine the source behind def endant's requests for admissions nos. 23-25 (relevant to Request No. 19). (C) In 14 days, defendant shall SHOW CAUSE why he should not provide plaintiff with unredacted copies of the two incident reports, the Butte County Jail list of plain tiff's enemies, and the documents referred to the D.A.'s office for prosecution (Bates DEF Nos. 000001-000004, 000005-000007, 000012, and 000019- 000050. (ECF No. 55 at 45-51; 56; 63-94.) (D) In his response to the order to show case, def endant shall also address whether the two DVDs produced to plaintiff contain the video or photographic evidence of plaintiff's injuries after the two incidents at issue here. (E) In all other respects, plaintiff's motion to compel is DEN IED. The discovery deadline is EXTENDED to 9/6/2018, solely for the purposes of the discovery identified in this order. Defendant shall respond to such discovery within 30 days. The pretrial motions deadline is CONTINUED to 12/6/2018. Plaintiff' ;s 59 , 60 duplicate motions are DENIED. Plaintiff's 64 motion to allow plaintiff to keep DVD's on his person is DENIED. Counsel for defendant shall coordinate with the litigation coordinator at HDSP to arrange a time for plaintiff t o review, within the next 30 days, the two DVDs and to allow plaintiff to make notes during such review. Plaintiff's 65 motion to allow two addresses is DENIED. Plaintiff's 67 second amended complaint is retained in the court file, but DISREGARDED. Plaintiff's 68 motion for relief from copy service is PARTIALLY GRANTED. (Yin, K)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/7/2018 DENYING 46 and 49 Motions for Extension of Time and PARTIALLY GRANTING 49 Motion for Court Order. Plaintiff's request for copies is granted. (Henshaw, R)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/14/18 ORDERING the stay of this action is lifted. Defendant Stratton shall file a responsive pleading within 14 days from the date of this order. (Plummer, M)
December 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/20/2017 ORDERING the custodian to produce Edward Roy Welch V-38933, to testify in USDC at 9:00 a.m. on 2/1/2018 in courtroom #9, before Magi strate Judge Gregory G. Hollows; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ; and the Clerk to serve a copy of this order and writ on the Out-to-Court Desk and Warden. (cc: GGH, OTCD-SAC)(Yin, K)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assigned DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to sch edule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. The Clerk shall serve copies of (a) plaintiff's complaint, (b) the screening order, and (c) the instant order, on Supervising DAG Monica Anderson. (cc: Monica Anderson) signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/07/17. (Plummer, M)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 09/01/17 ordering that plaintiff's 08/28/17 motion 26 is placed in the court file and disregarded. (Plummer, M)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Edward Roy Welch signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/24/17. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial)(Plummer, M)
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to the Sacramento Division, signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/9/17. New Case Number 1:17-cv-0337-MJS. Old Case Number 2:17-cv-0517-KJN. (Gonzalez, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Welch v. Butte County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Roy Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County Jail Officials
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Stratton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?