Davis v. Johnson et al

Plaintiff: Dennis Davis
Defendant: B. Johnson, L. Graves, Lapastora, - Ingram and Gallegos
Case Number: 2:2017cv00544
Filed: March 14, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/19/19 ADOPTING the findings and recommendations filed 3/13/19, in full; GRANTING Defendants' motion for summary judgment (ECF No. 37 ) as to defendants Johnson, Graves, LaPastora and Ingra m acting in their individual capacities and all defendants acting in their official capacities; and DENIED as to plaintiff's claim arising under the Eighth Amendment against defendant Gallegos acting in his individual capacity. (Becknal, R)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 3/13/2019 GRANTING IN PART 42 Motion to Strike, as discussed in this Order, and RECOMMENDING 37 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted as to defendants Johns on, Graves, LaPastora and Ingram acting in their individual capacities and all defendants acting in their official capacities and denied as to plaintiffs claim arising under the Eighth Amendment against defendant Gallegos acting in his individual capacity. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/26/18 DENYING 33 Motion for leave to file and amended complaint and DENYING 38 Motion to Stay. Plaintiff's amended complaint 34 is STRICKEN. (Plummer, M)
June 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/18/18 ORDERING that the pretrial motion deadline is extended up to and including, 7/20/18. (Becknal, R)
June 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/5/18 ADOPTING 20 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS: Any Fourteenth Amendment claim identified by plaintiff in his complaint is dismissed. (Kaminski, H)
May 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/15/2018 DENYING 23 Motion for the Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
April 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/25/18 GRANTING 21 Motion to modify the discovery and scheduling order. The impending pretrial motion deadline set in the Courts October 25, 2017 discovery and scheduling order is extended until thirty days after the district court issues an order on the April 18, 2018 findings and recommendations. (Plummer, M)
April 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/18/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 19 request for the appointment of counsel and RECOMMENDING any Fourteenth Amendment claim identified by plaintiff in his 1 complaint be dismissed. Referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER AND WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 10/5/2017 ORDERING the custodian to produce Dennis Davis E-66404, to testify in USDC at 1:00 p.m. on 10/19/2017 in courtroom #25, before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman; custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. (cc: ADR, KJN, OTCD-SAC) (Yin, K)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/25/2017 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Dennis Davis. The Director of the CDCR shall collect monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department)(Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lapastora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: - Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gallegos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?