Bufkin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Charles Bufkin
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2017cv00588
Filed: March 18, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/26/18 DENYING the Plaintiff's 17 motion for summary judgment; GRANTING the Commissioner's 18 cross-motion for summary judgment); AFFIRMING the final decision of the Commissioner, and ENTERING judgment for the Commissioner; the Clerk shall close this case. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
November 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STIPULATION and ORDER extending the time to December 18, 2017, for Plaintiff to file his Reply Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/27/17: (Kaminski, H)
September 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STIPULATION and ORDER extending time for Plaintiff to file Opening Brief signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/6/17. (Kaminski, H)
August 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/7/2017 ORDERING Plaintiff's time to file a motion for summary judgment brief is EXTENDED to 9/6/2017. (Washington, S)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 3/20/2017 ORDERING that plaintiff's 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. Service of process is appropriate for the Commissioner of Social Security. The Clerk of the Court is directed to s erve the undersigned's scheduling order in Social Security cases. Within fourteen (14) days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the United States Marshal and shall file a statement with the court that such documents have been submitted to the United States Marshal. The United States Marshal is directed to serve all process without prepayment of costs not later than sixty (60) days from the date of this order. (Zignago, K.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bufkin v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Bufkin
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Cynthia B. De Nardi
Represented By: Bobbie J. Montoya, ss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?