Pickern v. DeBon et al
Plaintiff: Brenda Pickern
Defendant: Reno A. DeBon, Alice M. DeBon and DeBon Family Living Trust
Case Number: 2:2017cv00591
Filed: March 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 10/13/17 ORDERING that this matter is DISMISSED with prejudice pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(2) and each side is to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall retain jurisdiction for the purpose of enforcing the parties' Settlement Agreement and General Release should such enforcement be necessary. CASE CLOSED(Becknal, R)
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/31/17: HEARING as to 14 Motion to Dismiss continued to 10/11/2017 at 10:00 AM in Redding before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Defendants' Reply is due 7 days prior to the hearing date. Counsel may appear telephonically. Plaintiff is to file a Notice of Settlement immediately upon execution of any settlement agreement. (Kaminski, H)
August 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 08/25/17 ORDERING that the 27 Request for Telephonic Appearance is GRANTED. (Benson, A.)
August 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/18/2017 ORDERING the 14 Motion to Dismiss RESET for 9/6/2017 at 10:00 AM in Redding (CMK) before Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison. Counsel who are not local are permitted and encouraged to attend telephonically. (Washington, S)
August 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 07/24/17 ORDERING that, pursuant to the 10 21 Consents of the parties, the above-captioned case is REASSIGNED and REFERRED to the magistrate judge for all further proceedings and entry of final judgment. Any hearing dates currently set before the undersigned are VACATED. The case number on all future filings shall be: 2:17-cv-0591 CMK. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pickern v. DeBon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Pickern
Represented By: Thomas Edward Frankovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reno A. DeBon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice M. DeBon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeBon Family Living Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?