Ortiz v. Enhanced Recovery Company
Plaintiff: Rene Ortiz
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company and CT Corporation System
Case Number: 2:2017cv00607
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/12/2020 ADOPTING in full 109 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 70 defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. Judgment is entered for defendants Enhanced Recovery Company, Kirk Moquin and Marty Sarim. All other defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 109 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 12/16/19 DENYING 63 Motion for default judgment without prejudice to renewal; DENYING 69 Motion for Protective Order without prejudice to renewal; DENYING 86 Motion to enforce and apply laws without prejudice to renewal. DENYING 91 Motion to Stay; 68 Motion for Judgment on the pleadings is WITHDRAWN. IT IS RECOMMENDED that 70 Motion for Summary Judgment be granted; Judgment be entered for defendan t Enhanced Recovery Company, defendant Kirk Moquin, and defendant Marty Sarim; All other defendants be dismissed without prejudice; and This action be closed. These Findings and Recommendations are submitted to U.S. District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to these F&Rs due within fourteen days. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/28/19 DENYING 89 and 88 Requests for hearing.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/28/19 CAUTIONING plaintiff that future improper conduct may result in monetary or terminating sanctions. (Coll, A)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 5/17/19 ORDERING that Plaintiff SHOW CAUSE in writing within 14 days of the date of this order as to why this case should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The 5/24/2019 hearing of plain tiff's 68 motion for judgment on the pleadings and defendant's 69 , 70 motions for a protective order and summary judgment is CONTINUED to 6/21/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. On or before 6/7/2019, plaintiff shall file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to defendant's motions. (Kastilahn, A)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/25/2019 DENIED without prejudice 54 Motion to Compel and 55 Motion for default judgment. GRANTING 57 Motion to modify the scheduling order. The 3/1/2019 hearing of defendants motion is VACATED. All pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery shall be completed by 5/24/2019. The 3/22/2019 Final Pretrial Conference and 5/6/2019 Jury Trial are VACATED pending resolution of any dispositive motion.(Reader, L)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/9/19 DENYING 47 Motion and DENYING 52 Ex Parte Application. (Coll, A)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/1/2018 ORDERING the 3/2/2018 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is continued to 3/23/2018 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom No. 27 before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes and any party may, but is not required to, file an updated status report on or before 3/16/2018. The parties are cautioned that failure to appear at the status conference may result in an order imposing an appropriate sanction. (Henshaw, R)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/22/18: Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 3/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff shall file and serve a status report on or before February 16, 2018, and defendant shall file and serve a status report on or before February 23, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
August 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 8/25/2017 ORDERING 10 the 9/1/2017 hearing of defendant's motion to strike is VACATED; Defendant's motion to strike is GRANTED; Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file an amended complaint; The amended complaint filed 6/5/2017 is DEEMED the operative complaint in this action1; and defendant shall file a response to the 6/5/2017 amended complaint within 21 days. (Reader, L)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/28/2017 CONTINUING the Motion Hearing on 10 Motion to Strike to 9/1/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes; ORDERING the plaintiff to file an opposition or statement of non-opposition to said motion by 8/18/2017; ORDERING the defendant to file any reply by 8/25/2017. (Michel, G.)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 7/24/17: Hearing as to 10 Motion to Strike is continued to 8/4/2017 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Defendant may file a reply to plaintiff's untimely July 20, 2017 opposition 15 on or before July 28, 2017. (Kaminski, H)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 6/12/2017 ORDERING that the 6/16/2017 Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is VACATED. (Zignago, K.)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 4/14/17 ORDERING a Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference is set for 6/16/17 at 10:00 PM in Courtroom 27 (DB) before Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. Plaintiff shall file and serve a status report on or before 6/2/17, and defendant shall file and serve a status report on or before 6/9/17. (Becknal, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Enhanced Recovery Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rene Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Enhanced Recovery Company
Represented By: Larissa G. Nefulda
Represented By: Stephen H. Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CT Corporation System
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?