United States of America v. Hill et al

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Melissa A. Hill, Zenith Group, Butte County Treasurer and Town of Paradise
Case Number: 2:2017cv00608
Filed: March 22, 2017
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: Morrison C. England
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 16, 2017 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 11/16/17 ORDERING that the 10/5/17 Order to Show Cause 20 is DISCHARGED as to Plaintiff. No Sanctions are imposed, and Plaintiff's MOTION for and order directing the Clerk to enter default against Defendant Hill 16 is DENIED without prejudice. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 5, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 10/5/2017 ORDERING The hearing on plaintiff's 16 motion for an order directing the clerk to enter defendant Hill's default is CONTINUED to 11/15/2017; Plaintiff and Ms. H ill shall show cause, in writing, by no later than 11/1/2017 why sanctions should not be imposed for their failure to appear at the 9/20/2017 hearing; Ms. Hill shall file an opposition or a statement of non-opposition to plaintiff's motion by 11/1/2017; Plaintiff may file a reply to defendant Hill's opposition, if any, not later than 11/8/2017. (Reader, L)
May 3, 2017 7 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 5/3/2017 ORDERING the stipulation between the United States and the Town of Paradise is APPROVED. If the United States succeeds in obtaining from the Court an Order of Forec losure and Judicial Sale of the real property at issue in this action, it shall submit to the Court a proposed order of sale consistent with the terms of that Stipulation. The United States and the Town of Paradise shall each bear their own costs. The Town of Paradise is EXCUSED from further participation in this action and is accordingly DISMISSED as a Defendant. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Hill et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa A. Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Butte County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Paradise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Mahana K. Weidler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?