Anza Technology, Inc. v. Mushkin, Inc.,
Plaintiff: Anza Technology, Inc.
Defendant: Mushkin, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00656
Filed: March 28, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:44
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 12/20/17 GRANTING 29 30 Motions to Dismiss or Transfer; plaintiff's claims against Mushkin are SEVERED AND TRANSFERRED to the District of Colorado for all further proceedings. Plaintiff's claims against Avant are SEVERED AND TRANSFERRED to the Western District of Texas for all further proceedings. CASE TRANSFERRED (Benson, A.)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 8/18/17: 12 Request to Seal Document(s) is DENIED without prejudice. (Kaminski, H)
June 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/14/2017 ORDERING: Mushkin, Inc. to file an answer or other response to 1 Complaint by 8/18/2017. The parties shall submit a Joint Status Report no later than 9/26/2017. The Initial Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 10/10/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Washington, S)
April 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/21/2017 ORDERING that defendant Mushkin, Inc. shall file an answer or other response to the Complaint on or before 6/19/2017. (Reader, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anza Technology, Inc. v. Mushkin, Inc.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anza Technology, Inc.
Represented By: Colby Brian Springer
Represented By: Hannah T. Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mushkin, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?