Gadomski v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Plaintiff: Kellie Gadomski
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00670
Filed: March 29, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 7/6/2020 DENYING 30 Motion to Dismiss and DIRECTING defendant to file a responsive pleading within 21 days. (Coll, A)
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 STIPULATION and ORDER (ECF No. 32 ) signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/13/2018 ORDERING the Hearing on Equifax's Motion to Dismiss and Strike Class Allegations (ECF No. 30 ) is RESET for 9/6/2018 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Krueger, M)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 6/12/2018 ORDERING that Equifax's date to respond to the Complaint is EXTENDED for 28 days, to and including 7/18/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/7/18 ORDERING the Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss and Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations 17 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court GRANTS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND Defenda nt's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First and Second Causes of Action for willful and negligent violations of 15 U.S.C. § 1681e(b); The Court GRANTS WITH LEAVE TO AMEND Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Caus e of Action for a negligent violation of 15 U.S.C. § 1681i(a); The Court GRANTS WITHOUT LEAVE TO AMEND Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's requests for equitable relief, and Plaintiff's request for statutory and punitive damages for a negligent violation of § 1681i(a); The Court DENIES Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations with respect to all four claims. (Becknal, R)
March 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 03/01/18. ORDERING that, pursuant to 24 Joint Motion, all proceedings and deadlines in this action are STAYED pending resolution of Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss and to Strike Plaintiff's Class Allegations. (Benson, A.)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 4/11/2017 ORDERING Defendant Equifax response to 1 Complaint due by 5/18/2017. (Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gadomski v. Equifax Information Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kellie Gadomski
Represented By: Seyed Abbas Kazerounian
Represented By: Matthew M. Loker
Represented By: Clark Ovruchesky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services LLC
Represented By: Matthew H. Dawson
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre, PHV
Represented By: Misty L. Peterson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?