Jones v Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Charles Jones
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC, Experian Information Solutions Inc., Equifax Information Services, LLC and Trans Union LLC
Case Number: 2:2017cv00689
Filed: March 30, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/2018 ORDERING The stipulated dismissal 63 is DENIED and the court's 8/8/2018 order to show cause 62 remains pending; plaintiff and Equifax are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE within 14 days why this case should not now be dismissed; Counsel for each party is advised that failure to comply with the court's order may result in sanctions, including monetary sanctions of $250.00. (Reader, L)
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER and ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/8/2018 EXTENDING the deadline to file a Stipulation for Dismissal to 7/11/2018, retroactively. Given that 7/11/2018 has passed, the parties shall SHOW CAUSE within fourteen (14) days why this case should not now be dismissed. (Zignago, K.)
April 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 04/12/17 ORDERING that the 2 Motion to Proceed IFP is GRANTED. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Jones
Represented By: Lauren Rode
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shellpoint Mortgage Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union LLC
Represented By: Eileen T Booth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?