Ixchel Pharma, LLC. v. Biogen Inc.
Plaintiff: Ixchel Pharma, LLC.
Defendant: Biogen Inc.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00715
Filed: April 4, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Antitrust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 50 STIPULATION AND FINAL JUDGMENT signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/9/18 dated *2/12/18* in favor of Biogen Inc. against Ixchel Pharma, LLC.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
January 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/25/18 GRANTING 37 Motion to Dismiss: Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a Third Amended Complaint, if it can do so consistent with this order. (Kaminski, H)
October 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 10/6/17 ORDERING that the briefing and hearing schedule for Biogen's Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint shall be as follows: Biogen's Opening Brief will be filed by 10/23/17. Ixchel's Opposition Brief will be filed by 11/13/17. Biogen's Reply Brief will be filed by 11/30/17. The hearing date shall be noticed for 1/8/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. The initial scheduling conference currently on calendar for 11/6/17 shall be CONTINUED to 1/29/18 at 1:30 p.m. The parties shall file their joint status report by no later than 1/15/18. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 STIPULATION and ORDER 30 signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/19/2017 continuing the Scheduling Conference to 11/6/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. An amended Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 10/23/2017. (Kirksey Smith, K)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM and ORDER re 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 9/12/2017: IT IS ORDERED that 20 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Plaintiff has twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a Second Amended Complaint, if it can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
June 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/16/17, ORDERING that Biogen's 16 Motion to Dismiss is MOOT. Biogen shall file a motion to dismiss, answer, or other response to the First Amended Complaint by 7/21/2017. Ixchel shall file its opposition to Biogen's motion to dismiss by 8/11/2017. Biogen shall file its reply in support of its motion to dismiss by 8/25/2017. The hearing on the motion to dismiss shall be noticed for hearing on 9/5/2017 at 1:30 pm. A Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 9/11/2017. (Kastilahn, A)
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 04/20/17 ORDERING that Biogen shall file a motion to dismiss, answer, or other response to the Complaint by 05/24/17; Ixchel shall file its opposition to any motion to dismiss by 07/14/ 17; Biogen shall file its reply by 07/28/17; Ixchel shall not move for a default judgment on the basis that Biogen has not filed a response to the Complaint by the original deadline of 04/26/17; the hearing on any motion to dismiss shall be 08/21/17 at 1:30 p.m.; Initial Scheduling Conference is RESET for 9/25/2017 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb with a Joint Status Report due by 09/11/17. (Benson, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ixchel Pharma, LLC. v. Biogen Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ixchel Pharma, LLC.
Represented By: Christopher David Banys
Represented By: Richard Cheng-Hong Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biogen Inc.
Represented By: Mark Samuel Popofsky
Represented By: William Lee Roberts, PHV
Represented By: Rocky Chiu-feng Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?